PrivaCash, Inc. v. American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: PrivaCash, Inc.
Defendant: American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. and American Express Prepaid Card Management Corporation
Case Number: 3:2013cv00086
Filed: February 5, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2014 190 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying as moot 45 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 49 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 58 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/21/14. (jat)
August 20, 2014 200 Opinion or Order of the Court Disregard; transmitted in error. 7th Circuit Court of Appeals notified. (jat) Modified on 8/20/2014 (jat).
February 26, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Recusal. District Judge William M. Conley recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 2/26/13. (krj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PrivaCash, Inc. v. American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PrivaCash, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas A. Lewry
Represented By: John S. LeRoy
Represented By: John M. Halan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc.
Represented By: David Morad Elihu
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Sung Hoon Kim
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Robson
Represented By: Jeffrey Allan Simmons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Prepaid Card Management Corporation
Represented By: David Morad Elihu
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Sung Hoon Kim
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Robson
Represented By: Jeffrey Allan Simmons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]