Grand River Enterprises Six Nations Ltd. v. VMR Products LLC

Plaintiff: Grand River Enterprises Six Nations Ltd.
Defendant: VMR Products LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00104
Filed: February 13, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2014 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 127 Motion to Supplement summary judgment record; granting in part and denying in part 129 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 4/23/14. (krj)
April 23, 2014 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 120 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 4/23/14. (krj)
May 29, 2014 197 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part the parties' Motions for Summary Judgment. ; granting 54 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer ; granting stipulation to dismiss count three; and denying 174 Motion for Sanctions Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 05/29/2014. (mfh)
June 5, 2014 207 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ruling on motions in limine. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/5/14. (krj)
November 26, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 28 Motion for Leave to File a sur-reply by plaintiff ; denying 15 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by defendant. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 11/26/2013. (voc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Grand River Enterprises Six Nations Ltd. v. VMR Products LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grand River Enterprises Six Nations Ltd.
Represented By: Katherine W. Schill
Represented By: Melissa H. Burkland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VMR Products LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]