Ali, Ouati v. Baenen, Michael

Petitioner: Ouati K. Ali
Respondent: Michael Baenen
Case Number: 3:2013cv00132
Filed: February 22, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Brown
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that petitioner Ouati Ali may have until September 20, 2013, to tell the court whether he wishes to pursue his unexhausted claims in state court or amend his petition to delete the unexhausted claims and proceed solely on the exhausted claims. If he fails to respond or otherwise does not comply with the instructions in this order, I will dismiss the entire petition without prejudice for his failure to exhaust his state court remedies, pursuant to Rose v. Lundy. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/5/2013. (jef),(ps)
October 9, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing petition for a writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 without prejudice so that petitioner may exhaust his state court remedies. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/9/2013. (jef),(ps)
October 9, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered dismissing the petition of Ouati K. Ali for a writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 without prejudice for his failure to exhaust state remedies. (PAO/jef). (jef),(ps)
April 30, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that petitioner Ouati K. Ali may have until May 17, 2013, in which to advise the court whether he can show that he exhausted his state court remedies with respect to the claims outlined within this order. If petitioner does not respond to this order by May 17, 2013, the court will assume that he wants to proceed only with the claims that appear to have been exhausted. At that point, the court will order a response from respondent. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/30/2013. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ali, Ouati v. Baenen, Michael
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ouati K. Ali
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Baenen
Represented By: Gregory M. Weber
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]