RBC Manufacturing Corporation v. Power Right Industries, LLC et al

Defendant: Power Right Industries, LLC and Lloyd's Equipment Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: RBC Manufacturing Corporation
Case Number: 3:2013cv00133
Filed: February 22, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Marathon
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 Motion for Sanctions ; Granting 50 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Granting 51 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 1/30/14. (voc)
January 31, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Regal Beloit America, Inc. against Lloyd's Equipment Co., Inc., Power Right Industries, LLC in the amount of $ 1,159,026.00. (BBC ). Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 1/30/2014. (voc)
February 18, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 58 Motion for Expedited Issuance of Clerk's Certification of a Judgment to be Registered in Another District Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 2/18/2014. (voc)
March 6, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Proof of Diversity Citizenship. Proof of Diversity Citizenship due 3/20/2013. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 3/6/2013. (voc)
March 25, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER remanding case to Marathon County Circuit Court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 3/25/13. (krj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RBC Manufacturing Corporation v. Power Right Industries, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Right Industries, LLC
Represented By: Richard L. Bolton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd's Equipment Co., Inc.
Represented By: Richard L. Bolton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RBC Manufacturing Corporation
Represented By: John C. Scheller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]