University of Wisconsin Hospital and Clinics, Inc. v. Aetna Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: University of Wisconsin Hospital and Clinics, Inc.
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00197
Filed: March 20, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER granting 7 Motion to Dismiss Counts II through IV of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendants Aetna Life Insurance Company, ADP TotalSource Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, ADP TotalSource, Inc. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/10/2013. (arw)
June 6, 2014 31 Featured Case ORDER granting 13 Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff University of Wisconsin Hospital and Clinics, Inc.; denying 17 Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants ADP TotalSource Inc. Health and Welfare Plan, ADP TotalSource, Inc. and Aetna Life Insurance Company. Plaintiff shall submit a calculation of benefits along with any prejudgment interest and an itemization of reasonable attorney fees by 6/20/2014. Defendant may respond by 7/7/2014. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 6/6/2014. (arw)
July 14, 2014 34 Featured Case ORDER awarding Plaintiff University of Wisconsin Hospital and Clinics, Inc. benefits in the amount of $11,485.24, prejudgment interest in the amount of $3,962.40, and attorney fees and costs in the amount of $7,353.70. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/14/2014. (arw)
July 17, 2014 35 Featured Case JUDGMENT entered in favor of plaintiff University of Wisconsin Hospital and Clinics, Inc. against defendants Aetna Life Insurance Company, ADP TotalSource, Inc. and ADP TotalSource, Inc. Health and Welfare Plan for healthcare benefits in the amount of $11,485.24, prejudgment interest in the amount of $3,962.40 and attorney fees and costs in the amount of $7,353.70. (JDP/PAO) (arw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: University of Wisconsin Hospital and Clinics, Inc. v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University of Wisconsin Hospital and Clinics, Inc.
Represented By: Mark S. Sweet
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Edna Sybil Kersting
Represented By: Christina Anne Katt
Represented By: Sean M. Gaynor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]