Hamlin, Christopher v. Holmes et al

Defendant: Bogutski, Moungey, Holmes, Wenzel, Burns, Ross, Lobianco and John Doe
Plaintiff: Christopher Hamlin
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00202
Filed: March 22, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dodge
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's 31 Motion to hold defendant's summary judgment motion in abeyance pending limited discovery; granting in part and denying in part defendants' 21 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's excessive forc e claim is DISMISSED without prejudice, but he may proceed on his claim regarding an unconstitutional strip search. Defendant C.O. Bogutski is DISMISSED from the case. Defendants' motion for clarification regarding the contours of plaintiff's conditions of confinement claim, dkt. #21, is GRANTED. Plaintiff's conditions of confinement claim is limited to a claim concerning the temperature of his cell. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 12/6/2013. (jef),(ps)
March 22, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 26.95 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 4/12/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 3/22/2013. (jef),(ps)
July 28, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing plaintiff Christopher J. Hamlin's Eighth Amendment conditions of confinement claim regarding placement in a cold cell. Defendant Andrew Moungey is DISMISSED from the case. Defendants' motion to disregard plaintiff's la te summary judgment response, Dkt. 58 , is DENIED. Defendants' motion for summary judgment, Dkt. 37 , is DENIED regarding plaintiff's Eighth Amendment strip search claims. The case will proceed to trial on those claims. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/28/2014. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hamlin, Christopher v. Holmes et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bogutski
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moungey
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holmes
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wenzel
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burns
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lobianco
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Hamlin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]