Welton Enterprises, Inc. et al v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Hy Cite/Welton, LLC, 3PP Plus Limited Partnership, Welton Enterprises, Inc. and Welton Family Limited Partnerships
Defendant: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00227
Filed: April 2, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER Requiring Proof of Diversity of Citizenship. Proof of Diversity of Citizenship due 5/20/2013. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 5/6/2013. (arw)
May 31, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER Requiring Confirmation of Citizenship. Plaintiff may have 30 days to confirm the citizenship of PEP Hy Cite Investments, LLC or voluntarily dismiss this case. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 5/31/2013. (arw)
March 5, 2014 53 Featured Case ORDER denying 25 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant The Cincinnati Insurance Company. Plaintiff Hy Cite/Welton, LLC is dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21. The caption is amended in accordance with this order. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 3/5/2014. (arw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Welton Enterprises, Inc. et al v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hy Cite/Welton, LLC
Represented By: Anthony K. Murdock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 3PP Plus Limited Partnership
Represented By: Anthony K. Murdock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Welton Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony K. Murdock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Welton Family Limited Partnerships
Represented By: Anthony K. Murdock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark W. Rattan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]