Humphrey, Frank et al v. Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc. et al

Defendant: Hardee's Food Systems, Inc. and Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Frank A. Humphrey
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00235
Filed: April 15, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER that plaintiff Frank Humphrey shall have until July 26, 2013, to file and serve a second amended complaint consistent with the instructions within the body of this order. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/26/2013. (jef),(ps)
April 18, 2013 2 Featured Case Initial Order for Paid Pro Se: Plaintiff directed to serve complaint. Proof of service due 6/10/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/18/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Procedure for serving a complaint, # 2 Wis. Stat. 801.11) (jef),(ps)
May 13, 2013 5 Featured Case ORDER that plaintiff may have until May 28, 2013 to file and serve an amended complaint containing good faith allegations sufficient to establish complete diversity of citizenship for purposes of determining subject matter jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. § 1332. Failure to amend timely shall result in prompt dismissal of this matter for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 5/13/2013. (elc),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Humphrey, Frank et al v. Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hardee's Food Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Tyler Kenneth Wilkinson
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Tyler Kenneth Wilkinson
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank A. Humphrey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]