Out RAGE LLC v. New Archery Products Corporation

Plaintiff: Out RAGE LLC
Defendant: New Archery Products Corporation
Counter_claimant: New Archery Products Corporation
Counter_defendant: Out RAGE LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv00240
Filed: April 8, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting deadlines re 6 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Out RAGE LLC. Brief in Opposition due 4/26/2013. Injunctive Hearing set for 5/2/2013 at 09:00 AM. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/11/13. (rep)
April 24, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding injunctive hearing. Procedure to be followed on Motions for Injunctive Relief before Judge Crabb attached. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/24/2013. (lak)
August 19, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 70 Motion for Redaction of Preliminary Injunction Hearing Transcript. The redacted version filed by defendant may be made available to the public on CM-ECF. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 8/16/13. (rep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Out RAGE LLC v. New Archery Products Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Out RAGE LLC
Represented By: Robert Jason Fowler
Represented By: Kevin Barry Collins
Represented By: Catherine Cetrangolo
Represented By: Alexander A. Berengaut
Represented By: Jay Isaac Alexander
Represented By: Emily S. Ullman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Archery Products Corporation
Represented By: Kenneth M. Albridge
Represented By: Michelle L. Dama
Represented By: Kevin David Erickson
Represented By: Jonathan H. Margolies
Represented By: John C. Scheller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: New Archery Products Corporation
Represented By: Kenneth M. Albridge
Represented By: Michelle L. Dama
Represented By: Kevin David Erickson
Represented By: John C. Scheller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Out RAGE LLC
Represented By: Jay Isaac Alexander
Represented By: Alexander A. Berengaut
Represented By: Catherine Cetrangolo
Represented By: Kevin Barry Collins
Represented By: Robert Jason Fowler
Represented By: Emily S. Ullman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]