Williams, Jessie v. Jones et al

Defendant: Jones and Braemer
Plaintiff: Jessie Williams
Case Number: 3:2013cv00248
Filed: April 10, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Winnebago
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 2, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plaintiff Jessie Williams may have until January 17, 2013, to file a response to defendant Jesse Jones's motion for summary judgment. If plaintiff does not respond by that date, I will dismiss the case with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 1/2/2014. (jef),(ps)
January 27, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plaintiff Jessie Williams's case is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). The clerk of court is directed to enter judgment in favor of defendant and close this case. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 1/27/2014. (jef),(ps)
January 27, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered dismissing this case. (PAO/jef). (jef),(ps)
June 18, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plaintiff Jessie Williams may have until July 2, 2013, to tell the court whether he wishes to proceed with his claim against defendant Jones or his claim against defendant Braemer under the number assigned to this case. Plaintiff must pick one and only one of these claims to proceed under case no. 13-cv-248-bbc. Plaintiff may have until July 2, 2013, to advise the court whether he wishes to pursue the other claim under a separate case number; or dismiss the other claim without preju dice so that he may file it at a later date. If plaintiff dismisses the other claim voluntarily, he will not owe a second filing fee. If he chooses to pursue the other claim, he will owe a separate $350 filing fee and will be assessed another in itial partial payment. If plaintiff fails to respond to this order by July 2, 2013, I will enter an order dismissing the lawsuit as it presently exists without prejudice for plaintiff's failure to prosecute it. Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/18/2013. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams, Jessie v. Jones et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Braemer
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]