Homesly, April v. United States of America

Defendant: United States of America
Plaintiff: April J. Homesly
Case Number: 3:2013cv00259
Filed: April 18, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER substituting the United States as defendant in place of Dr. Demetra Sifakis. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 5/10/2013. (elc),(ps)
May 14, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that briefing on defendant's motion for summary judgment, dkt. 6, is STAYED pending a telephonic pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/10/2013. (jef),(ps)
May 22, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER setting briefing on defendant's 6 motion for summary judgment. Plaintiff's brief in opposition due 6/20/2013. Defendant's brief in reply due 7/1/2013. If plaintiff chooses to file a motion to remand, it is due 6/20/2013. The government would have until July 1, 3013 to file any opposition to a remand motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/22/2013. (jef),(ps)
July 22, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defendant's 6 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff April Homesly's claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for her failure to file an administrative claim before filing suit. The clerk of court is directed to enter judgment for defendant and close this case. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/22/2013. (jef),(ps)
July 24, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendant United States dismissing this case. (PAO). (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Homesly, April v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Antonio M. Trillo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April J. Homesly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]