Decambaliza, Colleen v. QBE Holdings, Inc. et al

Defendant: Balboa Insurance Company, QBE Holdings, Inc., QBE Insurance Corporation, QBE Financial Institutional Risk Services, Inc., Bank of America Corporation, BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, Banc of America Insurance Services, Inc., Meritplan Insurance Company, Newport Management Corporation and Bank of America, N.A.
Plaintiff: Colleen Decambaliza
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00286
Filed: April 25, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Eau Claire
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying transfer to the MDL. Signed by John G. Heyburn II, Chairman of the Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (rep)
August 13, 2013 63 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/12/13. (krj)
October 25, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 Motion to Dismiss ; denying 40 Motion for Oral Argument on Motion to Dismiss; granting 41 Motion to Dismiss ; granting 43 Motion for Leave to File documents. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/25/13. (krj)
November 5, 2013 73 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendants BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, Balboa Insurance Company, Banc of America Insurance Services, Inc., Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Meritplan Insurance Company, Newport Management Corporation, QBE Financial Institutional Risk Services, Inc., QBE Holdings, Inc., and QBE Insurance Corporation. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 11/5/2013. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Decambaliza, Colleen v. QBE Holdings, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Balboa Insurance Company
Represented By: Dustin Brett Brown
Represented By: Kendall W. Harrison
Represented By: Stephen Michael LeBlanc
Represented By: Leslie Lynn Meredith
Represented By: Robyn C. Quattrone
Represented By: Amanda M. Raines
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Dustin Brett Brown
Represented By: Kendall W. Harrison
Represented By: Stephen Michael LeBlanc
Represented By: Leslie Lynn Meredith
Represented By: Robyn C. Quattrone
Represented By: Amanda M. Raines
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Dustin Brett Brown
Represented By: Kendall W. Harrison
Represented By: Stephen Michael LeBlanc
Represented By: Leslie Lynn Meredith
Represented By: Robyn C. Quattrone
Represented By: Amanda M. Raines
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE Financial Institutional Risk Services, Inc.
Represented By: Dustin Brett Brown
Represented By: Kendall W. Harrison
Represented By: Stephen Michael LeBlanc
Represented By: Leslie Lynn Meredith
Represented By: Robyn C. Quattrone
Represented By: Amanda M. Raines
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Andrew Martin Batchelor
Represented By: John C. Englander
Represented By: Matthew G. Lindenbaum
Represented By: Richard H Porter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP
Represented By: Andrew Martin Batchelor
Represented By: John C. Englander
Represented By: Matthew G. Lindenbaum
Represented By: Richard H Porter
Represented By: Amanda M. Raines
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banc of America Insurance Services, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Martin Batchelor
Represented By: John C. Englander
Represented By: Matthew G. Lindenbaum
Represented By: Richard H Porter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meritplan Insurance Company
Represented By: Dustin Brett Brown
Represented By: Kendall W. Harrison
Represented By: Stephen Michael LeBlanc
Represented By: Leslie Lynn Meredith
Represented By: Robyn C. Quattrone
Represented By: Amanda M. Raines
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newport Management Corporation
Represented By: Dustin Brett Brown
Represented By: Kendall W. Harrison
Represented By: Stephen Michael LeBlanc
Represented By: Leslie Lynn Meredith
Represented By: Robyn C. Quattrone
Represented By: Amanda M. Raines
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Andrew Martin Batchelor
Represented By: John C. Englander
Represented By: Matthew G. Lindenbaum
Represented By: Richard H. Porter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Decambaliza
Represented By: Kara Anne Elgersma
Represented By: Erin K. Dickinson
Represented By: Charles J. Crueger
Represented By: Edward A. Wallace
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]