Madison Boardwalk, LLC v. Omega Commercial Finance Corp. et al

Defendant: Jon S. Cummings, IV, Omega Commercial Finance Corp. and Von C. Cummings
Plaintiff: Madison Boardwalk, LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv00288
Filed: April 26, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Brown
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2014 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 70 Motion to Strike Expert Witnesses by Defendant Omega Commercial Finance Corp. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/4/2014. (arw)
September 17, 2014 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 92 Motion in Limine without prejudice to defendant renewing its relevancy objection at the Final Pretrial Conference. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/17/2014. (arw)
October 9, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Proof of Diversity of Citizenship. Proof of Diversity of Citizenship due 10/16/2013. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/9/2013. (arw)
November 8, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 19 Motion for Leave to File Sur Reply by Plaintiff Madison Boardwalk, LLC; denying 9 Motion to Dismiss for Improper Forum and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Defendants Jon S. Cummings, Omega Commercial Finance Corp. Plaintiff may have until 11/21/2013 to show that the individual defendants are citizens of Florida. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/7/2013. (arw)
June 23, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 40 Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Madison Boardwalk, LLC; granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Omega Commercial Finance Corp. The parties will proceed to trial on the fraudulent trade practices claim againstdefendant Omega, the misrepresentation claim against Von Cummings and the issue ofdamages. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/23/2014. (arw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madison Boardwalk, LLC v. Omega Commercial Finance Corp. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon S. Cummings, IV
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omega Commercial Finance Corp.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Von C. Cummings
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madison Boardwalk, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Ferris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]