Williams, Jessie v. Meil, Tony

Plaintiff: Jessie Williams
Defendant: Tony Meil
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00290
Filed: April 26, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Winnebago
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2013 4 Featured Case ORDER that plaintiff Jessie Williams may have until July 3, 2013, to file an amended complaint that includes the missing facts discussed in this order. If plaintiff fails to respond by July 3, 2013, I will dismiss the case for plaintiff's failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted and issue a strike in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/18/2013. (jef),(ps)
August 19, 2013 5 Featured Case ORDER dismissing case for plaintiff's failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Strike Recorded. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 8/19/2013. (elc),(ps)
August 20, 2013 7 Featured Case JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendant Tony Meil dismissing plaintiff's complaint for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/19/2013. (elc),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Williams, Jessie v. Meil, Tony
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Meil
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]