TCYK, LLC v. John Does 1-99

Defendant: John Does 1-99
Plaintiff: TCYK, LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00300
Filed: April 30, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Barron
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoenas Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/15/2013. (arw)
August 19, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 , 18 , 21 and 24 Motions to Quash subpoena. The internet service providers are to provide the identity of the Doe defendants to plaintiff's counsel on an attorney's eyes only basis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/19/13. (rep)
December 26, 2013 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 65 Motion for Entry of Default as to defendant Carrie Luehne. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 12/20/13. (rep)
January 10, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating entry of default against defendant Luehne. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 1/10/14. (rep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: TCYK, LLC v. John Does 1-99
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-99
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TCYK, LLC
Represented By: Keith A. Vogt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]