Walker, Lamont v. Keller, Chad et al

Defendant: Christine Broadbent, Brian Kool, Timothy Haines, Sarah Mason, D. Morgan, Janel Nickels, Chad Keller, Christine Beerkircher and Melonee Harper
Plaintiff: Lamont D. Walker
Case Number: 3:2013cv00342
Filed: May 15, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Grant
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court Disregard - clerical entry error. Modified on 10/15/2013 (jef).
May 20, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff to submit Trust fund account statement. Trust Fund Account Statement due 6/10/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 5/20/2013. (jef),(ps)
August 5, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot Plaintiff's 36 Motion to Strike. Defendants' 29 motion for summary judgment based on plaintiff's failure to properly exhaust his administrative remedies is GRANTED IN PART; plaintiff's due process claims against defendants Keller, Nickel and Morgan are DISMISSED without prejudice. Defendants may have until August 15, 2014 to submit a supplemental brief supporting their motion for summary judgment on exhaustion grounds as detailed in the opinion abo ve. Plaintiff may have until August 22, 2014 to file a response. Defendants may have until August 29, 2014 to file a reply. Plaintiff's 24 motion to supplement his complaint is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 8/05/2014. (nln),(ps)
June 6, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 1.34 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 6/28/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/6/2013. (jef),(ps)
July 31, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plaintiff may have until August 15, 2013, to identify for the courtwhether he wishes to proceed with Lawsuit #1 or Lawsuit #2 under the number assigned to this case and/or a separate case number. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/31/2013. (jef),(ps)
August 13, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER may have until August 26, 2013, to identify for the court whether he wishes to proceed with Lawsuit #1 or Lawsuit #2 under the number assigned to this case, and whether he wishes to proceed with the other case under another case number. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 8/13/2013. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker, Lamont v. Keller, Chad et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Broadbent
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Kool
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Haines
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Mason
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Morgan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janel Nickels
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Keller
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Beerkircher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melonee Harper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamont D. Walker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]