Ultratec, Inc. et al v. Sorenson Communications, Inc. et al

Defendant: Sorenson Communications, Inc. and CaptionCall, LLC
Plaintiff: CapTel, Inc. and Ultratec, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00346
Filed: May 17, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2014 211 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Either plaintiffs Ultratec, Inc. and Captel, Inc. or defendants Sorenson Communications, Inc. and CaptionCall, Inc. have until June 5, 2014 to file unsealed, redacted copies of the documents filed as exhibits no. 1-20, 22-46 and 48-51 to doc ket no. 85 . Along with this filing, the filing parties must explain the reasoning for each of their redactions. If the parties fail to file documents that comply with this order by that date, the documents will be unsealed in their entirety. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 5/29/14. (jat)
July 17, 2014 286 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 168 Motion to Strike. Defendants may have until 7/28/14 to file a supplemental expert report to rebut Ludwick's opinion on what equipment constitutes a "modem" in the CaptionCall call centers. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/17/14. (jat)
July 31, 2014 316 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 281 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/31/14. (jat)
August 1, 2014 320 Opinion or Order of the Court DEPOSITION ORDER as to Seiichi Yamamoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/1/2014. (arw)
August 1, 2014 322 Opinion or Order of the Court REVISED DEPOSITION ORDER as to Seiichi Yamamoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/1/2014. (arw)
August 28, 2014 350 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER granting 87 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (related to the invalidity of the remainder of the claims in the '801 patent). Claims 1, 2, 7 and 9 of U.S. Patent No. 8,379,801 are dismissed with prejudice in light of notice 270 . Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 8/28/14. (jat) Modified on 8/28/2014 (jat).
August 28, 2014 351 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 87 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (regarding direct infringement, nonanticipation and anticipation); granting in part and denying in part 79 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 165 Motion to Strike as untimely defendants' cross motions for summary judgment with respect to non-infringement and anticipation; denying as unnecessary 178 Motion to Strike undisclosed opinions of Benedict Occhiogrosso; denying as moot 241 Motion to Strike the declaration of Kevin Colwell. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 8/28/14. (jat)
August 28, 2014 352 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER re 87 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by CapTel, Inc., Ultratec, Inc.; 79 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Sorenson Communications, Inc., CaptionCall, LLC. Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment on defendants' counterclaim of breach of contract is granted. Defendants' motion for summary judgment on their "defense" of breach of contract is denied. Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment on defendan ts' affirmative defenses of patent misuse, unclean hands and equitable estoppel is denied. Defendants' motion for summary judgment on their affirmative defenses on adequacy of plaintiffs' relief at law (the "eBay requirements") and judicial, promissory and equitable estoppel is denied. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 8/28/14. (jat)
August 26, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/26/13. (krj)
November 14, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 42 Motion to Stay Pending inter partes Review by Defendants CaptionCall, LLC, Sorenson Communications, Inc. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/14/2013. (arw)
September 23, 2014 534 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting briefing deadlines on plaintiffs' "direction and control" theory. Plaintiffs' submission due 9/25/14. Defendants' response due 9/27/14. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/23/14. (rep)
September 29, 2014 546 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 394 Motion in Limine ; granting in part and staying in part 395 Motion in Limine ; denying as moot 399 Motion in Limine ; denying 404 Motion in Limine ; denying 411 Motion in Limine ; granting in part and denying in part [413 ] Motion in Limine ; denying 418 Motion in Limine ; denying as unnecessary 420 Motion in Limine ; granting 422 Motion in Limine ; reserving 424 Motion in Limine ; granting 426 Motion in Limine ; granting 428 Motion in Limine ; denying [43 5] Motion in Limine ; denying 437 Motion in Limine ; granting 439 Motion in Limine ; granting 441 Motion in Limine ; denying 442 Motion in Limine ; granting 446 Motion in Limine ; granting in part and denying in part 453 Motion in Limine ; granting in part and denying in part 456 Motion in Limine ; denying 470 Motion in Limine ; granting 471 Motion in Limine ; denying 478 Motion Requesting Claims Construction. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/29/14. (rep)
October 1, 2014 557 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 401 Motion in Limine no. 8; granting 402 Motion in Limine no. 9 with respect to plaintiffs' theory of secret prior art and denying as moot in all other respects; granting 535 Motion to correct apparent errors in the summary judgment order. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/1/14. (jat)
October 1, 2014 558 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiffs' claims that defendants' induced infringement of claims 1-8 of the '835 patent and claim 2 of the '740 patent are DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/1/14. (jat)
October 3, 2014 563 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 396 Motion in Limine no. 3, on one condition; granting 397 Motion in Limine no. 4 with one exception; denying 400 Motion in Limine no. 7; denying as moot 403 Motion in Limine no. 10; Reserving the ruling on 451 Motion in Limine no. 12; denying as moot 464 Motion in Limine no. 16. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/3/14. (jat)
October 8, 2014 579 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 398 Motion in Limine no. 5; reserving ruling on 458 Motion in limine no. 14; amending ruling on 563 Motion in limine no. 16; denying 572 Defendants' request to prohibit plaintiffs from arguing that Ryan was not enabled; ruling on evidence of Dr. Gregg Vanderheiden. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/8/14. (jat)
October 9, 2014 583 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 445 Motion in Limine (Daubert Motion) to Exclude Testimony of Bruce McFarlane; setting briefing on 466 Motion in Limine #17 to Preclude Certain Evidence and Opinion Testimony Regarding Damages. Defendants may have unti l 12:00 PM on Saturday, October 11, 2014 to file a response as outlined in this opinion. If defendants fail to provide an adequate explanation of Dr. Keith Ugone's reasoning, he will not be permitted to testify. Plaintiffs may have until 8:00 AM on Monday, October 13, 2014 to reply. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/9/2014. (arw)
October 10, 2014 586 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 560 Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Court's Order Granting in Part Defendants' Daubert Motion on Secondary Considerations. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/10/14. (rep)
October 21, 2014 634 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 395 Defendants' Motion to exclude evidence of their overall revenues, wealth and market share in the damages phase of the trial; granting 458 Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine no. 14 to the extent that defendants will not be allowed to present the testimony of Kelby Brick to the jury; granting in part and denying in part 460 Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to exclude the evidence of noninfringing alternatives; granting in part and denying in part 466 Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to exclude the report and testimony of damages expert Keith Ugone. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/21/14. (jat)
October 21, 2014 636 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 620 Motion Requesting Claims Construction. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/21/14. (jat)
November 3, 2014 688 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of CapTel, Inc., Ultratec, Inc. against CaptionCall, LLC, Sorenson Communications, Inc. in the amount of $ 44,126,822.00. (BBC /PAO). (jat)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ultratec, Inc. et al v. Sorenson Communications, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sorenson Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Allen A. Arntsen
Represented By: H. Dickson Burton
Represented By: Edgar R. Cataxinos
Represented By: Steven W. Gutke
Represented By: Allen C. Turner
Represented By: James C. Watson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaptionCall, LLC
Represented By: Allen A. Arntsen
Represented By: H. Dickson Burton
Represented By: Edgar R. Cataxinos
Represented By: Steven W. Gutke
Represented By: Allen C. Turner
Represented By: James C. Watson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CapTel, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony A. Tomaselli
Represented By: Martha Jahn Snyder
Represented By: Stephen James Gardner
Represented By: Kristin Graham Noel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ultratec, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony A. Tomaselli
Represented By: Martha Jahn Snyder
Represented By: Kristin Graham Noel
Represented By: Stephen James Gardner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]