Componex Corporation v. Electronics For Imaging, Inc.

Defendant: Electronics For Imaging, Inc.
Plaintiff: Componex Corporation
Case Number: 3:2013cv00384
Filed: May 30, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Rock
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2014 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Claim Construction Relating to the U.S. Patent No. 6,113,059. Defendant EFI's construction of the disputed terms, as described in this opinion, are adopted by the court. Defendant EFI's motion for non-infringement 41 is GRANTED w ith respect to claims 5-22 as to the '059 patent. The court reserves judgment on claims 1-4 and plaintiff Componex's motion for infringement 36 as to the '059 patent pending submission of the parties' claims chart and, if necessary, respective explanations. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 7/18/2014. (arw)
October 21, 2014 152 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER granting 36 Componex's Motion for Summary Judgment dismissing the inequitable conduct claim and denying the motion for infringement; granting 41 EFI's Motion for Summary Judgment of invalidity and no willful infringement; denying 88 Componex's Motion to Strike; denying 116 Componex's Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/21/14. (jat)
November 4, 2014 195 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER: Defendant EFI's motion for summary judgment on Componex's claims of non-infringement and willful infringement (dkt. # 41 ) is GRANTED in part with respect to claims 1-4 of the '059 patent and is otherwise DENIED. P laintiff's cross-motion on the same issues is DENIED. Defendant EFI's motion for damages (notice) (dkt. # 41 ) is GRANTED in part with respect to claims 1-4 of the '059 patent. On or before 11/14/2014 the parties are DIRECTED to file updated charts listing claims and products that remain in issue consistent with the court's claim constructions and summary judgment opinions. To the extent the parties are unable to agree, the parties may also file a trial brief on or before 11 /18/2014 addressing what, if any, dispute remains with respect to the facts and law of those individual claims and products, particularly with respect to any assertion of an implied license. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 11/4/14. (jat)
November 12, 2014 199 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Entering Judgment. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 11/12/14. (jat)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Componex Corporation v. Electronics For Imaging, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electronics For Imaging, Inc.
Represented By: John Addison Marlott
Represented By: David L. Witcoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Componex Corporation
Represented By: Danielle Elaine Wampole
Represented By: Harry E. Van Camp
Represented By: Deborah Carol Meiners
Represented By: Joseph Thomas Leone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]