Williams, Jessie v. Pollard, William et al

Defendant: William Pollard and Greff
Plaintiff: Jessie Williams
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00395
Filed: June 4, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dodge
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on ifp request: Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/13/2013. (jef),(ps)
July 24, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing 4 Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 8. (Amended Complaint due 8/13/2013. ) Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/23/2013. (jef),(ps)
August 23, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that case is DISMISSED for plaintiff Jessie Williams's failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The clerk of court is directed to enter judgment in favor of defendants and close this case. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 8/23/2013. (jef),(ps)
August 26, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants dismissing this case for plaintiff's failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. (PAO). (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Williams, Jessie v. Pollard, William et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Pollard
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greff
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]