Wagner, Kathleen v. Pfizer, Inc. and Greenstone, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: |
Kathleen Wagner |
Defendant: |
Pfizer, Inc. and Greenstone, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva USA, Teva Industries, Wyeth, Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc., and ESI Lederle, Pharmacia and Upjohn Company, Pharmacia Corporation and Barr Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Barr Laboratories |
Case Number: |
3:2013cv00497 |
Filed: |
July 12, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin |
Office: |
Madison Office |
County: |
Dane |
Presiding Judge: |
Barbara B. Crabb |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephen L. Crocker |
Nature of Suit: |
Personal Inj. Prod. Liability |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 2, 2015 |
Filing
110
JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Barr Pharmaceuticals, LLC (f/k/a Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc.) and Barr Laboratories, Inc. granting defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings and dismissing defendants Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Barr Pharmaceuticals, LLC and Barr Laboratories, Inc. with prejudice. (arw)
|
May 15, 2015 |
Filing
109
ORDER FOR DISMISSAL. Defendants Pfizer Inc., Wyeth LLC, Greenstone LLC, Pharmacia LLC, Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc., Esi Lederle, Pharmacia and Upjohn LLC, Pharmacia and Upjohn Company LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., and Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc. are DISMISSED from this case with prejudice and without costs and fees to any party. All pending motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 5/15/2015. (arw)
|
February 13, 2015 |
Filing
76
ORDER denying 64 Motion for Reconsideration and Motion for Protective Order; denying 70 Motion for Extension of Time; granting 73 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 2/13/2015. (nln)
|
July 11, 2014 |
Filing
52
ORDER granting 46 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Defendants Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Barr Pharmaceuticals, LLC (f/k/a Barr Pharmaceuticals Inc.), and Barr Laboratories, Inc. are DISMISSED from this case with prejudice. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/11/14. (jat)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Wagner, Kathleen v. Pfizer, Inc. and Greenstone, Ltd. et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Kathleen Wagner |
Represented By: |
Kathleen Ann Wagner |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc. and Greenstone, Ltd. |
Represented By: |
Michael Lauren Johnson |
Represented By: |
Erik William Snapp |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. |
Represented By: |
Erik William Snapp |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Teva USA, Teva Industries |
Represented By: |
Vincent J. Scipior |
Represented By: |
Erik William Snapp |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Wyeth, Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc., and ESI Lederle |
Represented By: |
Michael Lauren Johnson |
Represented By: |
Erik William Snapp |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Pharmacia and Upjohn Company, Pharmacia Corporation |
Represented By: |
Michael Lauren Johnson |
Represented By: |
Erik William Snapp |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Barr Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Barr Laboratories |
Represented By: |
Vincent J. Scipior |
Represented By: |
Erik William Snapp |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?