Gross, Andrew v. Werlinger

Petitioner: Andrew Gross, III
Respondent: Werlinger
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00508
Filed: July 18, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Marquette
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, denying as moot 6 Motion to Supplement; denying as moot 8 Motion for Requesting Evidentiary Hearing; denying as moot 9 Motion for Bail Pending Outcome of Writ. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/10/2013. (jef),(ps)
October 10, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered dismissing the petition of Andrew Gross III for a writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. § 2241 for lack of jurisdiction. (PAO/jef). (jef),(ps)
November 4, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Docketing Statement, Appeal Information Sheet, Docket Sheet and Judgment to Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals re 15 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: # 1 Info sheet, # 2 Docketing Statement, # 3 October 10, 2013 Order, # 4 Judgment, # 5 October 25, 2013 Order, # 6 Docket Sheet) (elc),(ps)
November 8, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that, no later than November 27, 2013, Gross must pay the appellate docketing fee ($455) or submit a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal together with a certified copy of his inmate trust fund account statement. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 11/8/2013. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gross, Andrew v. Werlinger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Andrew Gross, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Werlinger
Represented By: Leslie K. Herje
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]