Diehl, Earl v. Foster, Brian

Respondent: Brian Foster
Petitioner: Earl Diehl
Case Number: 3:2013cv00518
Filed: July 22, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Sheboygan
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Appeal Information Sheet, Docket Sheet and Judgment to Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals re 11 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # 1 7th Circuit Appeal Information Sheet, # 2 Order dismissing petition for writ of habeas corpus dated 9-17-2013, # 3 Judgment dismissing petition for writ of habeas corpus dated 9-19-2013, # 4 Order denying petitioner's motion for reconsideration dated 9-16-2014, # 5 Docket Sheet) (nln),(ps)
October 8, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Construing Notice of Appeal as Request to Proceed ifp. Leave to proceed ifp denied. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/8/2014. (jef),(ps)
September 18, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus for petitioner's failure to obtain the authorization required by 28 U.S.C. § 2244(b)(3)(A). Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/17/2013. (jef),(ps)
September 19, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that the petition of Earl Diehl for a writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 is dismissed for failure to obtain the authorization required by 28 U.S.C. § 2244(b)(3)(A). (PAO). (jef),(ps)
September 16, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING petitioner Earl Diehl's 6 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/16/2014. (nln),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diehl, Earl v. Foster, Brian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian Foster
Represented By: Gregory M. Weber
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Earl Diehl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]