King, James v. Werlinger, R.

Respondent: R. Werlinger
Petitioner: James T. King
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00537
Filed: July 30, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Marquette
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Docketing Statement, Appeal Information Sheet, Docket Sheet and Judgment to Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals re 9 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: # 1 Info Sheet, # 2 Docketing Statement, # 3 Notice of Transcript Information, # 4 Order entered 12/19/2013, # 5 Judgment, # 6 Order entered 1/13/2014, # 7 Docket Sheet) (elc),(ps)
January 31, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Petitioner within 20 days to submit either the $505.00 appellate docketing fee or submit a certified copy of his inmate trust fund account statement for the 6-month period preceding his appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 1/31/2014. (elc),(ps)
February 6, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting petitioner's 10 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. Initial partial filing fee of $ 65.00 assessed. (Initial partial filing fee due 3/6/2014.) Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 2/6/2014. (jef),(ps)
December 19, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing James T. King's 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 U.S.C. § 2241 for lack of jurisdiction because his claims do not fit within the savings clause found in 28 U.S.C. § 2255(e). Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 12/19/2013. (jef),(ps)
December 19, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered dismissing James T. King's 1 Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 U.S.C. § 2241 for lack of jurisdiction because his claims do not fit within the savings clause found in 28 § U.S.C. 2255(e). (PAO/jef). (jef),(ps)
January 13, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 1/13/2014. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: King, James v. Werlinger, R.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R. Werlinger
Represented By: Leslie K. Herje
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James T. King
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]