Sean Morrison Entertainment, LLC v. O'Flaherty Heim Egan & Birnbaum, Ltd. et al

Defendant: Kaitlan Young, Patricia Vidonic, Michelle Ould, Angela Magana, Heather Clark, Angela Hayes, Nicholas D. Thompson and O'Flaherty Heim Egan & Birnbaum, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Sean Morrison Entertainment, LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00753
Filed: October 29, 2013
 
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2014 36 Featured Case ORDER granting 22 Motion to Dismiss defendants O'Flaherty, Heim, Egan & Birnbaum, Ltd. and Nicholas D. Thompson. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 3/6/14. (krj)
April 18, 2014 50 Featured Case ORDER that plaintiff's 43 motion for entry of default is GRANTED as to defendant Kaitlan Young and DENIED as to defendant Heather Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 4/18/2014. (jef),(ps)
November 7, 2013 5 Featured Case ORDER that plaintiff may have until 11/25/2013, to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/7/2013. (voc)
November 27, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER granting 8 Motion to Dismiss defendant Barb Honchak. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/27/2013. (voc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Sean Morrison Entertainment, LLC v. O'Flaherty Heim Egan & Birnbaum, Ltd. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaitlan Young
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Vidonic
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Ould
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Magana
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Clark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Hayes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas D. Thompson
Represented By: Kevin M O'Hagan
Represented By: James William Davidson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Flaherty Heim Egan & Birnbaum, Ltd.
Represented By: Kevin M O'Hagan
Represented By: James William Davidson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Morrison Entertainment, LLC
Represented By: Heather Ryan Liberman
Represented By: David M. Adler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]