Boehm et al v. Zimprich et al

Plaintiff: Scott Boehm and David Stluka
Defendant: Dan Zimprich and Ciara Zimprich
Case Number: 3:2014cv00016
Filed: January 9, 2014
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2014 150 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 105 Motion to Continue; denying 123 Motion for Relief Under Rule 56(d)(1). Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 11/13/14. (jat)
December 17, 2014 171 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER granting 65 Sports Plus's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 70 American Family Insurance's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in substantial part 75 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 12/17/14. (jat)
December 19, 2014 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Telephone Status Conference. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 12/19/14. (jat)
February 20, 2015 183 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of David Stluka, Scott Boehm against Gameday Sports, Richard Moncher in the amount of $ 100,000.00 against each defendant and attorney fees and costs in the amount of $18,342.03 jointly and severally. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 2/19/15. (jat)
October 2, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER granting 90 Acuity, a mutual insurance company's Motion to Intervene, with the proviso that ACUITY's role will be to participate in the framing of the verdict form. ACUITY will not be allowed to conduct discovery, or otherwise participate in the litigation without specific advance approval of the court. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 10/2/14. (jat)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boehm et al v. Zimprich et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Boehm
Represented By: Kevin Patrick McCulloch
Represented By: Danial A. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Stluka
Represented By: Kevin Patrick McCulloch
Represented By: Danial A. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Zimprich
Represented By: Frank Joseph Colucci
Represented By: David Max Dahan
Represented By: Katherine Mary Lyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ciara Zimprich
Represented By: Frank Joseph Colucci
Represented By: David Max Dahan
Represented By: Katherine Mary Lyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]