The Paper Mill Store, Inc. v. Aarbs Paper, Inc. et al

Defendant: Aarbs Paper, Inc. and Does 1-10
Plaintiff: The Paper Mill Store, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv00354
Filed: May 16, 2014
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 6/19/14. (krj)
July 22, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Joint Motion to Vacate. The court will allow plaintiff ten days to submit a fee request, along with a copy of all billing records and actual work to date on the motion for default and preparing the motion for default judgment. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 7/22/14. (jat)
August 11, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff awarded attorney fees in the amount of $2,350.92. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/11/14. (jat)
September 16, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED JUDGMENT in favor of The Paper Mill Store, Inc. against Aarbs Paper, Inc. in the amount of $ 150,000.00 and PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/16/14. (jat)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Paper Mill Store, Inc. v. Aarbs Paper, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aarbs Paper, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Paper Mill Store, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Rosenfeld
Represented By: Conor Hughes Kennedy
Represented By: Adam L. Brookman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.