Smidt v. Ryle et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Richard J Smidt
Defendant: Franklin J Ryle, Wyoming Department of Transportation John Cox, Wyoming Highway Patrol Colonel Sam Powell, Jess Oyler, John Butler, Keith Groeneweg, Willie Price, Devan Henderson and Nate Hughes
Case Number: 2:2010cv00072
Filed: April 13, 2010
Court: Wyoming District Court
Office: Cheyenne Office
County: U.S. (County Unknown)
Referring Judge: William C Beaman
Presiding Judge: Clarence A Brimmer
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 14, 2010 VERBAL NOTICE of Settlement per email from Robert McCue to Law Clerk - All hearings VACATED. (sds, )
October 13, 2010 61 Featured Case ORDER by the Honorable Judge William C. Beaman Denying Without Prejudice 59 Motion to Withdraw John B. Speight as Counsel of Record. (scc, )
October 12, 2010 60 NOTICE by Plaintiff Richard J Smidt of Firm Name Change (Crank, Patrick)
October 12, 2010 59 REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Plaintiff Richard J Smidt. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Speight, John)
October 1, 2010 58 Featured Case ORDER by the Honorable Judge William C Beaman granting 57 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Matthew D Obrecht terminated (scc, )
September 29, 2010 57 REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Plaintiff Richard J Smidt. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Obrecht, Matthew)
September 17, 2010 56 RESPONSE to 52 Brief filed by Plaintiff Richard J Smidt. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2) (Crank, Patrick)
September 13, 2010 55 MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge William F Downes: Status Conference held on 9/13/2010. Parties discussed mediation with the Court, and the Court advised them that mediation would not be ordered. Court also instructed parties to use a mediator of their choice. Trial date will not be set until the parties contact the Court regarding the outcome of mediation. (Court Reporter Jamie Hendrich.) (sds, )
September 10, 2010 54 Featured Case ORDER Granting Stipulated Motion to Extend Time for Plaintiff to Respond to State's Brief by the Honorable Judge William F Downes re 53 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have to and including September 17, 2010 to respond to State Defendants' brief (stbd)
September 8, 2010 Motion No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge: 53 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Respond to State's Brief referred to trial judge. (sdb, )
September 8, 2010 53 REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Respond to State's Brief filed by Plaintiff Richard J Smidt. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Obrecht, Matthew)
September 1, 2010 52 State Defendants BRIEF on Scheduling Issues re 51 In Court Hearing, filed by Defendants John Butler, John Cox, Keith Groeneweg, Devan Henderson, Nate Hughes, Jess Oyler, Sam Powell, Willie Price. (Westby, Melissa)
August 18, 2010 51 MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge William F Downes: Status Conference held on 8/18/2010. The Court directed parties to brief the issues and cite 10th Circuit law. Defense is given 14 days to file their brief, the plaintiffs are given 10 days to respond. There will be no Initial Pretrial Order entered until this issue is resolved. (Court Reporter Jamie Hendrich.) (sds, )
August 11, 2010 50 NOTICE of Hearing:Status/Scheduling Conference set for 8/18/2010 11:00 AM before Judge William F Downes. All parties shall appear by telephone, with Plaintiff's counsel initiating the call, through a conference call operator, and connecting to the Court at 307-232-2600. Call must be placed through a conference call operator or the hearing will be rescheduled at the Court's convenience. Parties are advised to have their calendars available for the hearing. (sds, )
July 27, 2010 49 ANSWER to 48 Counterclaim, by Plaintiff Richard J Smidt, Counter Defendant Richard J Smidt. (Obrecht, Matthew) Modified on 9/16/2010 (sds, ).
July 7, 2010 48 ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Counter-Defendant Richard J Smidt by State Defendants John Cox, Sam Powell, Jess Oyler, John Butler, Keith Groeneweg, Willie Price, Nate Hughes and Devan Henderson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Westby, Melissa) Text modified on 7/8/2010 (sdn, ).
June 23, 2010 47 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2010 09:00 AM in Judge Beaman's Chambers (Room #2204) before Judge William C Beaman. (sdb, )
June 23, 2010 46 Featured Case ORDER by the Honorable Judge William F Downes denying 15 Motion to Dismiss (sdownes1)
June 14, 2010 45 MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge William F Downes: Motion Hearing held on 6/14/2010 as to Defendant's 15 Motion to Dismiss. The Court heard argument by both Counsel and took the matter under advisement. (Court Reporter Jamie Hendrich.) (stbd)
May 28, 2010 44 Featured Case ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Request for Leave of the Court to Depose Franklin J Ryle by the Honorable Judge William C Beaman. (szf, ).
May 25, 2010 43 NOTICE of Hearing on 15 MOTION to Dismiss, Motion Hearing set for 6/14/2010 01:30 PM in Casper Courtroom #2 (Room #204) before Judge William F Downes. The Court has allotted one hour for this hearing. (sds, )
May 25, 2010 Motion No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge: 42 MOTION for Joinder - Non-Dispositive to Plaintiff's Request for Hearing (Doc. 40) referred to trial judge (pertains to Motion to Dismiss). (sdb, )
May 25, 2010 42 REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. MOTION for Joinder - Dispositive to Plaintiff's Request for Hearing on Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 40) filed by Defendants John Butler, John Cox, Keith Groeneweg, Sam Powell, Willie Price, Devan Henderson, Nate Hughes, Jess Oyler. (Westby, Melissa) Text modified on 5/25/2010 (sdn, ).
May 21, 2010 41 RESPONSE to 16 Memorandum in Support, 15 Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Richard J Smidt. (Crank, Patrick)
May 21, 2010 40 REQUEST for hearing on Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Richard J Smidt. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Crank, Patrick)
May 21, 2010 39 PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by Plaintiff Richard J Smidt. (Crank, Patrick)
May 21, 2010 38 RESPONSE to 15 Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Richard J Smidt. (Crank, Patrick)
May 21, 2010 37 Featured Case ORDER by the Honorable Judge William F Downes granting 36 Motion to File Excess Pages (sds, )
May 20, 2010 36 Stipulated MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Plaintiff Richard J Smidt. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Crank, Patrick)
May 12, 2010 35 ENTRY OF DEFAULT filed against Franklin J Ryle by the Clerk of Court, Stephan Harris. (sds, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/12/2010: # 1 Corrected Entry of Default) (sds, ).
May 12, 2010 34 Featured Case ORDER by the Honorable Judge William F Downes granting 31 Motion to Withdraw Motion. (sds, )
May 12, 2010 33 MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge William C Beaman. Motion Hearing held on 5/12/2010. (Court Reporter Jan Davis.) (szf, )
May 12, 2010 Motion No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge: 31 MOTION to Withdraw Document 30 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Franklin J. Ryle referred to trial judge. (sdb, )
May 12, 2010 32 MOTION for Entry of Default against Franklin J. Ryle filed by Plaintiff Richard J Smidt. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Obrecht, Matthew)
May 12, 2010 31 REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. MOTION to Withdraw Document 30 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Franklin J. Ryle filed by Plaintiff Richard J Smidt. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Obrecht, Matthew)
April 29, 2010 11 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by the Honorable Judge Clarence A Brimmer. Case reassigned to Judge William F Downes for all further proceedings. Judge Clarence A Brimmer no longer assigned to case. File sent to Casper Clerk's office on April 29, 2010. (szf, )
April 23, 2010 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard J Smidt. Devan Henderson served on 4/20/2010, answer due 5/11/2010. (Crank, Patrick)
April 23, 2010 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard J Smidt. Franklin J Ryle served on 4/18/2010, answer due 5/10/2010. (Crank, Patrick)
April 13, 2010 8 Praecipe for 9 Summons filed by Plaintiff Richard J Smidt. (sbad, )
April 13, 2010 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury filed by Plaintiff Richard J Smidt. (sbad, )
April 13, 2010 6 NOTICE of complexity by Plaintiff Richard J Smidt ; this case is non-complex. (sbad, )
April 13, 2010 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew D Obrecht on behalf of Richard J Smidt (sbad, )
April 13, 2010 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick J Crank on behalf of Richard J Smidt (sbad, )
April 13, 2010 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Thomas McCue on behalf of Richard J Smidt (sbad, )
April 13, 2010 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John (Jack) B Speight on behalf of Richard J Smidt (sbad, )
April 13, 2010 1 COMPLAINT (9 summons(es) issued) with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $350 receipt #CHY008922.), filed by Richard J Smidt. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sbad, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smidt v. Ryle et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard J Smidt
Represented By: Patrick J Crank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin J Ryle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyoming Department of Transportation John Cox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyoming Highway Patrol Colonel Sam Powell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jess Oyler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Butler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Groeneweg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Price
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devan Henderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nate Hughes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]