McDonnell v. McCarthy et al (INMATE1)

Case Number: 1:2006cv00347
Filed: April 17, 2006
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 24, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that: (1) The 29 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; and (2) That this case is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure of the plaintiff to comply with the orders of this court. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 2/24/2009. (cb, )
February 4, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be dismissed without prejudice for failure of the plf to comply with the orders of this court; Objections to R&R due by 2/17/2009. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 2/4/2009. (wcl, )
April 19, 2006 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full as further set out; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at HCJ; furn:cashier. Signed by Judge Susan Russ Walker on 4/18/06. (vma, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonnell v. McCarthy et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?