McCray v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc

Case Number: 1:2006cv01123
Filed: December 20, 2006
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2009 80 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that the plaintiff's application to proceed without prepaying fees or costs is Denied. Nothing in this ruling precludes the plaintiff from petitioning the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals for leave to proceed with his appeal in forma pauperis or from proceeding with the appeal. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 05/05/09. (ydw, )
March 17, 2009 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER overruling plaintiff's 70 objections; adopting 67 Report and Recommendations; granting 40 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting 42 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 52 Motion for Denial of Summary Judgment; dismissing this case. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 3/17/2009. (cc, )
February 23, 2009 67 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that 40 MOTION for Judgment on the pleadings and 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment be granted; that 52 MOTION for denial of summary judgment be denied; that this case be dismissed; Objections to R&R due by 3/9/2009. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 2/23/2009. (cc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCray v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?