Mayes v. United States of America (INMATE3)

Plaintiff: Charlie Mayes
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2007cv00253
Filed: March 22, 2007
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2010 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; that the Clerk of this court is hereby DIRECTED to: 1. Open a new civil action under 28 U.S.C. § 2241. 2. Docket the instant pleading (currently docketed as 49 in Civil Action No. 1:07cv253-MEF) in the newly opened civil action under 28 U.S.C. § 2241. 3. Strike the instant pleading, 49 , from Civil Action No. 1:07cv253-MEF. 4. Assign the newly opened case to the Magistrate Judge and District Judge to whom the instant case is assigned; and 5. Refer the case file to the appropriate Magistrate Judge for further proceedings upon completion of the foregoing directives. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 10/13/2010. (jg, )
March 3, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER overruling petitioner's 35 Objection to Report and Recommendations; adopting 28 Report and Recommendations; denying 1 28 U.S.C. § 2255 motion filed by Mayes as the claims therein entitle him to no relief. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 3/3/2009. (cc, )
November 21, 2008 28 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that 1 28 U.S.C. § 2255 motion filed by Mayes be denied, as the claims therein entitle him to no relief; Objections to R&R due by 12/4/2008. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 11/21/2008. (cc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayes v. United States of America (INMATE3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Susan R. Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie Mayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?