Hill v. Astrue (CONSENT)

Plaintiff: Randy Hill
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 1:2009cv00001
Filed: January 5, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV Office
County: Coffee
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Coody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion for Attorney Fees to the extent that the plaintiff be and is hereby AWARDED fees and expenses in the amount of $1843.75; it is further ORDERED that to the extent that plaintiffs counsel requests that fees be awarded directly to counsel, the motion be and is hereby DENIED. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 7/16/10. (scn, )
June 30, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that on or before July 15, 2010, the plaintiff shall file a reply to the Defendant's 27 Response to the 25 Motion for Attorney's Fees. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 6/30/10. (scn, )
June 21, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that on or before July 6, 2010, the defendant shall show cause as to why the 25 Motion for Attorney Fees should not be granted. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 6/21/10. (scn, )
April 15, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT, in accordance with the memorandum opinion entered herewith, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the decision of the Commissioner be and is hereby REVERSED and that this case be and is hereby REMANDED to the Commissioner for further consideration and proceedings consistent with the memorandum opinion entered herewith. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 4/15/10. Also mailed w/copy of Memorandum Opinion and Order to Chief Judge SSA & Office of Hearings and Appeals.(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Astrue (CONSENT)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Hill
Represented By: Brian Roy Carmichael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?