Lawson et al v. KFH Industries

Plaintiff: Gregory Lawson and Bobby Wells
Defendant: KFH Industries
Case Number: 1:2009cv00609
Filed: June 29, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: Houston
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 18, 2011 84 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying the 80 Motion for Attorney's Fees and 82 Motion to Alter or Amend. Signed by Honorable W. Harold Albritton, III on 2/18/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(br, )
January 24, 2011 77 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 67 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable W. Harold Albritton, III on 1/24/2011. (br, )
August 13, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting Telephone Conference for 8/19/2010 @ 09:00 AM before Honorable W. Harold Albritton III; directing counsel for the parties to jointly arrange for and place the call. Signed by Honorable W. Harold Albritton, III on 8/13/10. Furnished to YG, HC & EB.(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawson et al v. KFH Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Lawson
Represented By: Ann Carroll Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Wells
Represented By: Ann Carroll Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KFH Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?