Sanders v. Hughes et al (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Malcolm Sanders
Defendant: Andy R. Hughes and Keith Reed
Case Number: 1:2009cv00856
Filed: September 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Dothan Office
County: Houston
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER that 34 Report and Recommendations is ADOPTED and this case is DISMISSED without prejudice due to Plaintiff's failures to prosecute this action and to comply with the orders of this court; that a separate judgment shall issue. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 6/9/2011. (cc, )
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDERED that on or before January 26, 2010 Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendants' written report. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 1/5/2009. (cb, )
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying 16 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 11/20/2009. (cb, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Hughes et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malcolm Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy R. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?