Jones v. Ward et al

Plaintiff: Donna Jones
Defendant: Greg Ward, Fred Hamic, Kirke Adams, Stephen Smith, Hazel Odom, Ray Minshew, Geneva County Commission and Geneva County Personnel Board
Case Number: 1:2010cv00202
Filed: March 8, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2012 138 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing as follows: (1) Geneva County Personnel Board and Hazel Odom's combined 99 MOTION for Summary Judgment is GRANTED; (2) Geneva County Commission and Fred Hamic's combined 101 MOTION for Summary Judgment is GRANTED; (3) Donna Jones's 108 MOTION for Protective Order is DENIED as moot; (4) the defendants' 114 MOTION to Strike is DENIED as moot; (5) the defendants' 137 MOTION to Stay Trial and All Pending Deadlines is DENIED as moot. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 7/13/12. (djy, )
July 1, 2011 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 79 Objection is OVERRULED as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 7/1/2011. (dmn)
June 9, 2011 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Defendants' Motions to Strike portions of the Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Docs. 67 , 69 ). The Motions were filed because Plaintiff included the word "substantive" in both the caption of Claim IV and paragraph 73 of the 65 Amended Complaint. This Court's 44 Memorandum Opinion and Order dated 3/30/2011 dismissed with prejudice the Plaintiff's substantive due process claims. It is ORDERED that: 1. The Defendants' 67 Motion to Strike and 69 M otion to Strike are GRANTED. 2. The Plaintiff's 65 Amended Complaint is STRICKEN from the record. 3. The Plaintiff shall file a Second Amended Complaint on or before 6/14/2011. The Second Amended Complaint shall not contain any references to a substantive due process claim. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 6/9/2011. (dmn)
May 18, 2011 63 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that the defendants' 55 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED with leave to refile after sufficient time for discovery has passed. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff's 59 Motion for Discovery is GRANTED. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 5/18/2011. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Ward et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Jones
Represented By: Susan Gale Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Hamic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirke Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hazel Odom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Minshew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geneva County Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geneva County Personnel Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?