Emojevwe v. United States of America (INMATE 3)

Plaintiff: Robert Ovuorye Emojevwe
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2010cv00317
Filed: April 12, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 15 Recommendation be and is hereby ADOPTED and that the motion to vacate sentence filed by defendant Robert Ovuorye Emojevwe be and is hereby DENIED. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 12/4/2012. (jg, )
May 4, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to serve a copy of the petitioners § 1 and 3 2255 motion as amended upon the United States Attorney for the Middle District of Alabama. The United States Attorney is ORDERED to file a response to the § 2255 motion on or before June 3, 2010, addressing the applicability of the one-year period of limitation in this case pursuant to the provisions contained in 28 U.S.C. § 2255. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 5/4/2010. (cb, )
April 19, 2010 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED re 1 Motion to Vacate that on or before May 10, 2010, Emojevwe shall advise this court whether he seeks to do one of the following: (1) Proceed before this court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2255 on those claims presented in his motion; (2) Amend his motion to assert any additional claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2255 on which he wishes to challenge the conviction and sentence imposed upon him by this court; or (3) Withdraw his motion. Emojevwe is CAUTIONED that if he fails to file a response in compliance with this order, which requires that he advise the court that he wishes to do one of the above,this cause shall proceed as an action under 28 U.S.C. § 2255, with the court considering only those claims presented in his original motion. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 4/19/2010. (cb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emojevwe v. United States of America (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ovuorye Emojevwe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Charles R. Niven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?