Pouncey v. McCory(INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Terrence Pouncey
Defendant: Mamie McCory
Case Number: 1:2011cv00030
Filed: January 12, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Dothan Office
County: Houston
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER that: 1. The plaintiff's objection 51 filed on September 20, 2013 to the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is overruled; 2. The Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge 50 entered on August 23, 2013 is adopted; 3. Defendant's motions for summary judgment 15 , 32 , 47 are GRANTED as further set out; 4. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice under 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(a) for Plaintiff's failure to exhaust an available administrative remedy prior to filing suit. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 9/30/2013. (jg, )
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER directing that on or before October 26, 2011 Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendant's 32 written report, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 10/5/11. (scn, )
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER directing that on or before April 22, 2011 Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendant's written report, as further set out; Clerk is DIRECTED to furnish Plaintiff with a copy of Document Numbers 14 and 15 as well as a copy of the docket sheet in the captioned action. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 4/1/11. (scn, )
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying 7 Motion to Amend, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 1/31/11. (scn, )
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON MOTION granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; further ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20 percent of each preceding month's income credited to his account as payments towards the $350.00 filing fee; and (2) Those persons having custody of Plaintiff shall forward the above described payments from Plaintiff's account to the clerk of this court each time the amount in his account exceeds $10.00 until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; the clerk is DIRECTED to furnish a copy of this order to the inmate account clerk at the Dothan City Jail. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 1/19/11. (Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk. ) (scn, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pouncey v. McCory(INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence Pouncey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mamie McCory
Represented By: Derel Kevan Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?