AAA Cooper Transportation v. Wes-Pak, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: AAA Cooper Transportation
Defendant: Wes-Pak, Inc., Vimy Ridge Partners, LLC and Pratt Industries (USA) Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00181
Filed: March 15, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: Houston
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2012 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Plaintiff AAA Cooper Transportation's 62 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice and Wes-Pak's 68 Response. It is ORDERED that AAA Cooper's Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice will be GRANTED on the following conditions impos ed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(2): 1. Before AAA Cooper files a new suit against Wes-Pak for claims included, or which could have been included, in this suit, it must pay to the attorneys for Wes-Pak in this case the sum of $2,000 to be appli ed to attorneys fees and expenses incurred here. 2. AAA Cooper must file a statement in this court no later than 6/28/2012 stipulating and agreeing to this condition; otherwise, the motion will be denied. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 6/19/2012. (dmn, )
March 13, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: 1. The 27 Motion to Amend is GRANTED. 2. VRP's 11 Motion to Dismiss, as now addressed to the Amended Complaint, is GRANTED on the basis of want of personal jurisdiction. 3. Defendant Vinny Ridge Partners, LLC is DISMISSED as a party defendant for want of personal jurisdiction. 4. The 21 Motion to Strike Affidavit of William D. Prickett, III is GRANTED, Mr. Pickett having testified at the hearing. 5. The 32 Motion to Quash of Pratt Industries is DENIED AS MOOT. 6. The case will proceed against Wes-Pak, Inc. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 3/13/2012. (dmn, )
November 17, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that, upon consideration of the request by the parties for a continuance of the evidentiary hearing in order for the parties to complete depositions for this matter, the court orders: The evidentiary hearing set for December 1, 2011 shall be reset for December 21, 2011 at 2:00 p.m.. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 11/17/11. (Furnished to Calendar and EB)(scn, )
September 16, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that: (1) Defendant's 44 Objection to Testimony by J. David Kuntz is OVERRULED; (2.) Plaintiff's Request that Defendant make Mr. Westerman and Mr. Lessel available for deposition is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 9/16/11. (scn, )
July 18, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that both parties may, if they so chose, object to this procedure, or file any new arguments with respect to the 27 Motion to Amend or 11 Motion to Dismiss, by July 27, 2011, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 7/18/11. (scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AAA Cooper Transportation v. Wes-Pak, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AAA Cooper Transportation
Represented By: J. David Kuntz
Represented By: Wade Hampton Baxley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wes-Pak, Inc.
Represented By: Steadman Stapleton Shealy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vimy Ridge Partners, LLC
Represented By: Patricia Romano Osuch
Represented By: James Northcutt Walter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pratt Industries (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?