Pouncey v. McCory (INMATE2)
Plaintiff: Terrence Pouncey
Defendant: Mamie McCory
Case Number: 1:2011cv00707
Filed: August 30, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Dothan Office
County: Houston
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER that: 1. The plaintiff's objection 27 filed on September 20, 2013 to the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is overruled; 2. The Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge 23 entered on August 27, 2013 is adopted; 3. Defendant's motions for summary judgment 6 & 17 are GRANTED as further set out; 4. This case be DISMISSED with prejudice as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 9/30/2013. (jg, )
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that on or before November 14, 2011 Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendants 6 written report as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 10/24/2011. (jg, )
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON MOTION that 2 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and inmate account clerk at the Dothan City Jail. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 9/9/2011. (jg, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pouncey v. McCory (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence Pouncey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mamie McCory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?