Al-Ameen v. Woodall (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Muhammad Al-Ameen
Defendant: Carla H. Woodall
Case Number: 1:2012cv00188
Filed: February 29, 2012
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: St. Clair
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Nature of Suit: Mandamus and Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 6, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that: (1) plt be granted an extension of time from 7/10/2012o and including 7/30/12 to file documents, as further set out in order; (2) if the plf does not have these documents in his possession as previously stated in his complaint, he shall on or before July 30, 2012 file a sworn statement or affidavit indicating the lack of these documents and explaining why he previously informed the court these documents were in his possession, as further set out in order; (3) granting the defendant an extension to and including 8/15/2012 to file her written report and answer. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 7/6/12. (djy, )
May 24, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED granting 15 Motion to Compel, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/24/2012. (wcl, )
April 30, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion to Compel to the extent addressed in this order, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/30/2012. (wcl, )
March 2, 2012 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plf and account clerk at St. Clair Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 3/2/2012. (furn: Cashier) (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Al-Ameen v. Woodall (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muhammad Al-Ameen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla H. Woodall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?