Smith v. United States of America (INMATE 3)

Plaintiff: Rickey Randell Wrex Smith
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2012cv01006
Filed: November 13, 2012
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 8, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Before the court are Petitioner's Motions for Leave to Object to the Recommendation (Docs. 38 - 39 .) The motions are due to be denied as untimely insofar as Petitioner seeks leave to file objections to the Recommendation. For Petitioner s benefit, however, the motions will be construed as containing a singular motion to alter or amend the judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59(e). Because Petitioner has presented no grounds that entitle him to relief under Rule 59(e), it is ORDERED that his motion to alter or amend the judgment (Docs. 38 - 39 ) is DENIED as further set out in the order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 4/8/2015. (dmn, )
March 19, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 31 Recommendation. Petitioner's 1 28 U.S.C. § 2255 Petition is DENIED. This action is DISMISSED with prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/19/2015. (dmn, )
February 3, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 31 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. Petitioner's 1 28 U.S.C. § 2255 petition is DENIED; and this action is DISMISSED with prejudice.A separate final judgment will be entered. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 2/3/2015. (dmn, )
February 18, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before 3/10/2014, Smith may file a reply to the 21 Supplemental Response filed by the United States as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 2/18/2014. (dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. United States of America (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rickey Randell Wrex Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Brandon K. Essig
Represented By: Tommie Brown Hardwick
Represented By: John Thomas Harmon
Represented By: Nathan D. Stump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?