McBride v. Houston County Health Care Authority et al

Plaintiff: Courtney McBride
Defendant: Houston County Health Care Authority, Dinish Karumanchi, City of Dothan, Greg Benton and Board of Commissioners of the City of Dothan
Case Number: 1:2012cv01047
Filed: November 29, 2012
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2015 398 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that this case is closed administratively pending the appeal. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/22/15. (djy, )
July 17, 2015 392 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED that plaintiff Courtney McBride's oral objection to the civil Allen charge is overruled. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/17/2015. (kh, )
July 10, 2015 381 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plaintiff Courtney McBride is to respond by noon on 7/13/2015, tot he argument that she is not entitled to punitive damages as set forth in defendant Dinesh Karumanchi's 377 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/10/2015. (dmn, )
July 8, 2015 375 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED that the court still has jurisdiction over the state-law claim against defendant Dinesh Karumanchi. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/8/2015.(kh, )
July 6, 2015 372 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that this defendant's motion in limine (doc. no. 310 ) and motion to quash (doc. no. 368 ) are denied as moot; that its outstanding objections to plaintiff Courtney McBride's deposition designations, exhibit list, and witness list (doc. nos. 311 , 312 , and 313 ) are overruled as moot; and that plaintiff McBride's objection to the Health Care Authority's exhibit list (doc. no. 301 ) is overruled as moot. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/6/2015. (kh, )
June 11, 2015 292 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that defendant Dinesh Karumanchi's 199 Motion to Exclude Dr. Robert Auerbach, Dr. Carla Rodgers, and Dr. Allan Nineberg is denied as further set out in the opinion and order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/11/2015. (dmn, )
March 30, 2015 259 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that defendant Dinesh Karmunachi's 184 & 212 motions to strike are denied. In resolving the pending summary-judgment motions, the court has implicitly considered the motions to strike as a notice of objections to the testimony described and has considered any related briefs as arguments on the objections; as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3/30/2015. (kh, )
September 15, 2014 192 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that Plaintiff's 145 Motion to Compel Production of Personnel File of Defendant Dinesh Karumanchi and Deposition of Corporate Representative of Defendant Houston County Healthcare Authority be and is hereby DENIED as further set out in the opinion and order. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 9/15/2014. (dmn, )
September 3, 2014 189 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as follows: (1) Defendants' 133 Motion to Strike the Testimony and/or Opinion of Plaintiff's Expert Carol E. Dankin, and 134 Motion to Strike and Exclude Testimony of Carol Dakin PhD, RN be and are hereby DE NIED as further set out in the order. (2) Defendants 136 Motion in Limine to Exclude or Limit Testimony From Plaintiffs Experts, 138 Motion to Strike and Preclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Carla Rodgers, Dr. Allan Nineberg, and Dr. Robert Auerbach, and 151 Supplemental Motion in Limine to Exclude or Limit Testimony From Plaintiffs Experts be and are hereby DENIED as further set out in the order. (3) To the extent that Defendants request that Dr. Nineberg be stricken as an expert witness, the 109 Motion to Strike, 110 Motion to Strike, 136 Motion in Limine to Exclude or Limit Testimony From Plaintiffs Experts, and 151 Supplemental Motion in Limine to Exclude or Limit Testimony From Plaintiffs Experts be and are hereby DENIED as f urther set out in the order. (4) To the extent Defendants request that Dr. Nineberg supplement his written report, the 109 Motion to Strike, 110 Motion to Strike, 136 Motion in Limine to Exclude or Limit Testimony From Plaintiffs Experts, and [ 151] Supplemental Motion in Limine to Exclude or Limit Testimony From Plaintiffs Experts be and are hereby GRANTED as further set out in the order. Dr. Nineberg shall supplement his report within seven (7) days of the date of this order. Defendants e xperts shall have fourteen (14) days from the date that Plaintiff submits Dr. Ninebergs supplemented written report, to supplement their written reports. (5) To the extent that Defendants request that the Plaintiff be prohibited from conducting disco very on issues contained in Dr. Rodgers expert report that exceed the scope of the Plaintiffs complaint, the 109 Motion to Strike, and 110 Motion to Strike be and are hereby DENIED as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 9/3/2014. (dmn, )
March 7, 2014 102 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER granting Defendant's 101 Joint MOTION for Protective Order as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 3/7/2014. (dmn, )
February 24, 2014 100 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as follows: (1) Plf's 58 Motion to Quash Subpoenas and Motion for Protective Order, 60 Motion to Quash Subpoenas and Motion for Protective Order be and are hereby DENIED; (2) The parties have until on or before 3 /7/2014 to submit a joint proposed protective order to govern Plf's psychiatric treatment records; (3) Plf's 83 Motion to Compel Supplemental Responses be and is hereby DENIED; and (4) Dft's 63 Motion to Compel be and is hereby DENIED; however, the dft is granted leave to conduct up to five additional discovery requests related to plf's medical treatment history. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 2/24/2014. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McBride v. Houston County Health Care Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney McBride
Represented By: Gerald Clark Brooks, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston County Health Care Authority
Represented By: Benjamin Collier Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dinish Karumanchi
Represented By: Michael Thomas Scivley
Represented By: Michael Kevin Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Dothan
Represented By: Derel Kevan Kelly
Represented By: James Hillary Pike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Benton
Represented By: Derel Kevan Kelly
Represented By: James Hillary Pike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Commissioners of the City of Dothan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?