Cherch v. Mock et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Kenneth Cherch
Defendant: Jim Mock, Tyler Dean Hurst, Corporal Vickers and Geneva City Police Department
Case Number: 1:2013cv00586
Filed: August 16, 2013
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: Geneva
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER: It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the 38 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge be and is hereby ADOPTED, and this case be and is hereby DISMISSED as follows: 1. Defendants' 33 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED; 2. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Final Judgment will be entered in favor of Defendants. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 9/19/2016. (dmn, ) Modified on 9/19/2016 to reflect correct signature date, 9/19/2016. (dmn, )
September 8, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that: 1. Defendants' 24 Objection to the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge that this matter be stayed is SUSTAINED; 2. The 23 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED in part and is REJECTED as moot in part as further set out in the order. 3. This case is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 9/8/2014. (dmn, )
October 16, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that: 1. The 4 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; 2. Plaintiff's claims against the Geneva City Police Department are DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C.  67; 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); 3. The Geneva City Police Department is DISMISSED as a party to this cause of action; and 4. This case, with respect to the claims against the remaining defendants, is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for appropriate proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 10/16/2013. (dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cherch v. Mock et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Cherch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Mock
Represented By: James Hillary Pike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Dean Hurst
Represented By: James Hillary Pike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporal Vickers
Represented By: James Hillary Pike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geneva City Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?