Johnson v. Benton et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Fred Johnson
Defendant: Greg Benton, Marc Crews, Ray Mock, William Kaufman, John Givens and Taiwan Truitt
Case Number: 1:2013cv00672
Filed: September 18, 2013
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: Houston
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Nature of Suit: Mandamus and Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION: Upon review of the document filed by the plaintiff on 10/7/2013 (Doc. No. 13 ), which the court construes to contain a Motion for Service of Documents, it is ORDERED that the motion be and is hereby GRANTED to the extent addressed h erein. The Clerk is DIRECTED to provide the plaintiff with a copy of the order entered on 10/3/2013 requiring that the defendants file an answer and written report (Doc. No. [7)] as this is the only orderentered by the court since his filing an amendment to the complaint which was sent to the plaintiff at the Houston County Jail. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 10/10/2013. Copy with copy of Doc. 7 mailed to Plaintiff as directed.(dmn, )
October 9, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that on or before 10/30/2013 the Chief of Police for the Dothan Police Department shall file under seal a current home and/or employment address for John Givens and Marc Crews, individuals the plaintiff identifies as former employees of the Dothan Police Department, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 10/9/13. (djy, ). Also mailed to chief of police @ Dothan PD (qc/djy, ).
September 20, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that on or before 10/4/2013 the plaintiff shall file an amendment to his complaint in which he advises the court of the date of the incident at issue and the date on which he was taken into custody with respect to the incident. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 9/20/13. (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Benton et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Crews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Mock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taiwan Truitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?