Hayes v. Vectrus Systems Corporation
Plaintiff: William Randall Hayes
Defendant: Vectrus Systems Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv00845
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Filing 13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Vectrus Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - Benjamin Han)(Geisler, Kimberly)
November 26, 2018 Filing 12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Vectrus Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - Alex Drummond)(Geisler, Kimberly)
November 26, 2018 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Geisler, Kimberly)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/26/2018; directing counsel for the parties to complete and send to the Clerk the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the clerk on or before 11/26/2018, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 10/29/18. (djy, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (defendant) Vectrus Systems Corporation. (djy, )
October 24, 2018 ***Attorney Alex S. Drummond for Vectrus Systems Corporation added pursuant to #7 answer (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Vectrus Systems Corporation. (Geisler, Kimberly)
October 24, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Vectrus Systems Corporation.(Geisler, Kimberly)
October 5, 2018 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by Laura McHaney for Vectrus Systems Corporation served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. (djy, )
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Vectrus Systems Corporation and mailed CMRRR with copy of complaint to defendant. (djy, )
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by William Randall Hayes re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Michel, Anthony)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to William Randall Hayes; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, )
October 2, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (plaintiff) William Randall Hayes. (djy, )
September 28, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by William Randall Hayes. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #1 ). (djy, )
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vectrus Systems Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602050851.), filed by William Randall Hayes. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet, #2 fee receipt)(djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayes v. Vectrus Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vectrus Systems Corporation
Represented By: Alex S. Drummond
Represented By: Kimberly Wood Geisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Randall Hayes
Represented By: Anthony David Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?