Newtek Small Business Finance, LLC v. Armstrong et al
Plaintiff: Newtek Small Business Finance, LLC
Defendant: Tami Armstrong, Joann Armstrong, Lawrence Armstrong and Andrew Wayne Armstrong
Case Number: 1:2018cv00968
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Non-Compliance re #17 Notice of Service of Discovery Document, which is hereby STRICKEN pursuant to the Local Rules regarding non-filing of civil discovery. (wcl, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 17 (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES RE: NON-FILING OF CIVIL DISCOVERY) (NOTICE of Service of Discovery Document) INTERROGATORIES Propounded to Newtek Small Business Finance, LLC by Andrew Wayne Armstrong, Lawrence Armstrong, Tami Armstrong.(Espy, Collier) Modified on 1/2/2019 to correct the docket text to reflect as a "Notice of Service of Discovery Document" (wcl, ).
December 28, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Non-Compliance re #15 Interrogatories Propounded. The referenced document is discovery and is not allowed pursuant to Local Rule 26.3 NON-FILING OF CIVIL DISCOVERY. The document is hereby STRICKEN from the record and the parties are instructed to disregard the entry of this document on the court docket. (dmn, )
December 27, 2018 Filing 15 [STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD. THIS DOCUMENT IS DISCOVERY AND IS NOT ALLOWED PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 26.3 NON-FILING OF CIVIL DISCOVERY.] INTERROGATORIES Propounded to Newtek Small Business Finance, LLC by Andrew Wayne Armstrong, Lawrence Armstrong, Tami Armstrong.(Espy, Collier) Modified on 12/28/2018 (dmn, ).
December 27, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Andrew Wayne Armstrong, Lawrence Armstrong, Tami Armstrong.(Espy, Collier)
December 13, 2018 Filing 13 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Tami Armstrong. (Espy, Collier)
December 13, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Lawrence Armstrong. (Espy, Collier)
December 13, 2018 Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Andrew Wayne Armstrong. (Espy, Collier)
December 11, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Defendants Andrew Wayne Armstrong, Lawrence Armstrong, Tami Armstrong. (dmn, )
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plaintiff Newtek Small Business Finance, LLC. (dmn, )
December 10, 2018 ***Attorney Collier Hollan Espy, Jr added for Andrew Wayne Armstrong, Lawrence Armstrong, Tami Armstrong. (dmn, )(NO PDF, see Doc. #7 for pdf.)
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #5 Summons Issued, #3 Summons Issued Acknowledgement filed by Lawrence Armstrong, Tami Armstrong. (Espy, Collier)
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #6 Summons Issued Acknowledgement filed by Andrew Wayne Armstrong. (Espy, Collier)
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrew Wayne Armstrong and returned to counsel for personal service. (dmn, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Lawrence Armstrong and returned to counsel for personal service. (dmn, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Joann Armstrong and returned to counsel for personal service. (dmn, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Tami Armstrong and returned to counsel for personal service. (dmn, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Newtek Small Business Finance, LLC. (dmn, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Wayne Armstrong, Joann Armstrong, Lawrence Armstrong, Tami Armstrong ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602051455.), filed by Newtek Small Business Finance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Filing Fee Receipt)(dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newtek Small Business Finance, LLC v. Armstrong et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tami Armstrong
Represented By: Collier Hollan Espy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joann Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Armstrong
Represented By: Collier Hollan Espy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Wayne Armstrong
Represented By: Collier Hollan Espy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Newtek Small Business Finance, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Justin Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?