Carn v. Hammer's Recycling, LLC
Plaintiff: William C. Carn, III
Defendant: Hammer's Recycling, LLC
Debtor: SpecAlloy Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018mc03827
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Dothan Office
County: Houston
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by William C. Carn, III. (Elrod, John)
August 23, 2018 Filing 11 SECOND Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to William C. Carn, III; Corporate Disclosures due by 9/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(alm, )
August 10, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Hammer's Recycling, LLC re #7 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Fritz, Michael) Modified on 8/10/2018 to add the link to the #7 Notice(alm, ).
August 8, 2018 Filing 9 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Emily C. Marks as Presiding Judge; Chief Judge William Keith Watkins no longer assigned to the case. (alm, )
August 3, 2018 Filing 8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to William C. Carn, III; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(alm, )
August 3, 2018 Filing 7 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Hammer's Recycling, LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(alm, )
August 3, 2018 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 Amended MOTION to Withdraw Reference and to Continue the Trial Date filed by William C. Carn, III. (Elrod, John)
July 23, 2018 Filing 5 Amended MOTION to Withdraw Reference and to Continue the Trial Date by Hammer's Recycling, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Fritz, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/24/2018 to redact personal information contained in original filing pursuant to the E-government rules: #5 Exhibit C (Redacted)) (alm, ). Modified on 7/24/2018 (alm, ).
July 23, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Roland Gary Jones on behalf of Hammer's Recycling, LLC (Fritz, Michael) Modified on 7/24/2018 to reflect this notice of appearance was filed on behalf of Atty Jones & not Atty Fritz; counsel e-filed using Atty Fritz log-in credentials (alm, ).
July 23, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Aaron Fritz, Sr on behalf of Hammer's Recycling, LLC (Fritz, Michael)
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Clerk's Certificate of the record re #1 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference. (Attachments: #1 USBC Certified Docket Sheet)(alm, )
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference and to Continue the Trial date by Hammer's Recycling, LLC. (alm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carn v. Hammer's Recycling, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: SpecAlloy Corporation
Represented By: John Douglas Elrod
Represented By: Benjamin R. Keck
Represented By: Cameron Anthony Metcalf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William C. Carn, III
Represented By: William Carlisle Carn, III
Represented By: John Douglas Elrod
Represented By: Regan Loper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hammer's Recycling, LLC
Represented By: Roland Gary Jones
Represented By: Michael Aaron Fritz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?