Carn v. Coreman, LLC
Plaintiff: William C. Carn, III
Defendant: Coreman, LLC
Debtor: SpecAlloy Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018mc03828
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Dothan Office
County: Houston
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by William C. Carn, III. (Elrod, John)
August 10, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Coreman, LLC. (Fritz, Michael)
August 8, 2018 Filing 8 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Emily C. Marks. Chief Judge William Keith Watkins no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (dmn, )
August 3, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 Amended MOTION to Withdraw Reference and to Continue the Trial Date filed by William C. Carn, III. (Elrod, John)
July 23, 2018 Filing 6 Bankruptcy Clerk's Amended Certificate of the record re #4 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference and to Continue the Trial Date. (Attachments: #1 ALMB Certified Docket Sheet - AP 17-01054)(wcl, )
July 23, 2018 Filing 3 Amended MOTION to Withdraw Reference and to Continue the Trial Date by Coreman, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Fritz, Michael) Modified on 7/23/2018 to reflect actual title. (dmn, )
July 23, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Roland Gary Jones, Esq. on behalf of Coreman, LLC (Fritz, Michael) Modified on 7/23/2018 to reflect proper attorney name making appearance. (dmn, )
July 23, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Aaron Fritz, Sr on behalf of Coreman, LLC (Fritz, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carn v. Coreman, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coreman, LLC
Represented By: Roland Gary Jones
Represented By: Michael Aaron Fritz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: SpecAlloy Corporation
Represented By: John Douglas Elrod
Represented By: Benjamin R. Keck
Represented By: Cameron Anthony Metcalf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William C. Carn, III
Represented By: John Douglas Elrod
Represented By: William Carlisle Carn, III
Represented By: Regan Loper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?