Pritchett v. Filmore et al (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Mike Pritchett
Defendant: Dale County Alabama, Mark Anderson, William H. Filmore, Scotty Ballard, David J. Harrison, Anthony Phillips, City of Enterprise, Alabama, Thomas Kirk Adams and Lee F. Knowles
Case Number: 1:2019cv00047
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Charles S Coody
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 OBJECTION to #5 Report and Recommendations by Mike Pritchett. (kr, )
February 21, 2019 No objections filed to the #5 Recommendation. (No pdf attached) (kr, )
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ON MOTION: ORDER denying #6 Motion to Recuse. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 2/11/2019. (kr, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Recuse Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody by Mike Pritchett. (dmn, )
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: 1) The plaintiff's claims against William H. Filmore, Thomas Kirke Adams, Lee F. Knowles and David J. Harrison seeking relief for actions which occurred during state criminal proceedings before the Circuit Court of Dale County, Alabama be DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to the directives of 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(i), (ii) and (iii); 2) The plaintiff's claims which go to the fundamental legality of his trafficking in marijuana conviction and the resulting sentence imposed upon him by the Circuit Court of Dale County, Alabama be dismissed without prejudice in accordance with the provisions of 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) as such claims are provide no basis for relief at this time; 3) This case be dismissed prior to service of process pursuant to the directives of 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(i), (ii) and (iii); Objections to R&R due by 2/14/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 1/31/2019. (kr, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Partial Filing fee received: $ 43.83, receipt number 4602052201. (wcl, )
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON MOTION: ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $43.83 be paid on or before 2/7/2019; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Copies mailed to plf and account clerk at Fountain Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 1/16/2019. (furn: cashier) (wcl, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Mike Pritchett. (Attachments: #1 Motion IFP)(es, ) (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/16/2019) (wcl, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/16/2019) (wcl, ).
January 14, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Mike Pritchett.(No PDF document attached - see docket entry #1 ). (es, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Thomas Kirk Adams, Mark Anderson, Scotty Ballard, City of Enterprise, Alabama, Dale County Alabama, William H. Filmore, David J. Harrison, Lee F. Knowles, Anthony Phillips, filed by Mike Pritchett.(es, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/16/2019) (wcl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pritchett v. Filmore et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale County Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William H. Filmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scotty Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Enterprise, Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Kirk Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee F. Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Pritchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?