Berry v. Grier (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Joshua Berry
Defendant: Officer Grier
Case Number: 1:2019cv00260
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: W Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Charles S Coody
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the Order of the court entered on this day adopting the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, Final Judgment is entered in favor of Defs and against Plf, and this case is DISMISSED without prejudice; DIRECTING the Clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a Final Judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the FRCP. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 5/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(cnw, )
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: the Recommendation is ADOPTED, and it is hereby ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice prior to service of process under 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 5/24/2019. (cnw, )
May 23, 2019 No objections filed to the #6 Recommendation. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge this case be DISMISSED without prejudice prior to service of process under 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii); Objections to R&R due by 5/17/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/3/2019. (cnw, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 Response to Order re #4 Order by Joshua Berry. (cnw, )
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 4/26/2019, Plf shall file an amendment to his complaint which specifically describes how the def acted in violation of his equal protection rights, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/12/2019. (cnw, )
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON MOTION: granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plf and account clerk at Houston County Jail. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/12/2019. (furn: cashier)(cnw, ) Modified on 4/12/2019 to add furnish cashier (qc/cnw, ).
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Joshua Berry. (beh, )
April 10, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Joshua Berry. (No PDF for this entry - See Docket Entry #1 ) (beh, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Officer Grier, filed by Joshua Berry. (beh, ) Modified on 4/11/2019 to remove no IFP text (qc/djy, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berry v. Grier (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Grier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?