Pearson v. Equifax (MAG+)
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Pearson
Defendant: Equifax
Case Number: 1:2019cv00302
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: it is ORDERED that plf's #3 motion to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED without prejudice; The Magistrate Judge further RECOMMENDS that this case be DISMISSED without prejudice for plf's failing to comply with the court's orders to show cause and to pay the filing fee or file an amended motion to proceed in forma pauperis with a supporting affidavit; Objections to R&R due by 7/16/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 7/1/2019. (alm, )
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by the Plf why this case should not be dismissed without prejudice due to plf's failure to pay the filing fee or submit an amended motion to proceed in forma pauperis with a supporting financial affidavit as required; Show Cause Response due by 6/21/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 6/10/2019. (Copy mailed CMRRR & regular mail to Plf) (alm, )
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: it is ORDERED that, on or before 6/3/2019, plf shall file an amended motion to proceed in forma pauperis that includes a supporting affidavit; DIRECTING the Clerk to provide plf with the relevant form. (AO-240 form-Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Short Form)). Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 5/13/2019. (Copy of IFP short form mailed to Plf as directed)(alm, ) (Main Document 7 replaced on 5/13/2019 to reflect the form mailed to Plf as an AO-240 & not an AO-239) (alm, ). Modified on 5/13/2019 (alm, ).
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Lorenzo Pearson re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (alm, )
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636, this case be and is hereby REFERRED to the United States Magistrate Judge for all pretrial proceedings and entry of any orders or recommendation as may be appropriate. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 5/1/19. (djy, )
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Lorenzo Pearson; Corporate Disclosures due by 5/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(alm, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lorenzo Pearson. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Document)(alm, )
April 29, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lorenzo Pearson. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (alm, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Equifax, filed by Lorenzo Pearson. (alm, )
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER, entered in case # 1:19-cv-00204-WKW, DIRECTING the Clerk to to strike Plf's Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and what has been styled as Plf's Amended Verified Complaint from the record in this case and to open a new case with those documents. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 4/29/2019. (alm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pearson v. Equifax (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?